Friday, January 19, 2018
 Results 1 - 5 of 5 for ten years. (0.20 seconds)
Search results

Teach Your Kids Arithmetic - "The Nifty Five Square Technique" by Joe Pagano
... In order to calculate the product of 15 x 15, all one need do is take the digit 1, which is the tens digit and multiply that by one more than the tens digit. Thus 1 + 1 = 2, and 1 x 2 = 2. Then just attach 25 to the number 2 to get your product. Thus 15 x 15 = 225. For the other numbers we have the following: 25 x 25 = 625 (2 x 3 = 6) 35 x 35 = 1225 (3 x 4 = 12) 45 x 45 = 2025 (4 x 5 = 20) 55 x 55 = 3025 (5 x 6 = 30) 65 x 65 = 4225 (6 x 7 = 42) 75 x 75 = 5625 (7 x 8 = 56) 85 x 85 ...

The Stock Exchange - A Beginners Guide by Stuart Langridge
... The second year started well too and within 6 months of year two, our small company growth share portfolio (the only portfolio) was up comfortably over 100%. Nice work if you can get it. For those of you that haven't been a member of an investment club and don't know, they are a democracy. Every opinion counts equal in a vote to buy or sell, whether they understand investment - or not. Here was our trouble. If you can believe it, making an enormous profit was 'boring' and they needed ...

... What about savants, who can memorize tens of thousands of years' worth of dates but can't tie their own shoes? Almost everyone in the world can be classified as "smart" in their own respect, so let's just keep that in mind as we further explore the question posed in the title of the article. I think the real definition of "smartness" has nothing to do with IQ or the ability to do mental gymnastics such as quick math or fact memorization. We are ALL born with our own limitations.

Future Shock - and Network Marketing Distributors by Nili Raam
...  The appearance of the "Homo Sapience" - 500,000 years ago  Start of agriculture  10,000 years ago  Invention of writing and the wheel  5,500 years ago  Creation of "City-state" in Greece  3,200 years ago  Invention of print  1436 Start of the industrial revolution - 1750 Invention of the car 1769  Invention of Telephone  1870  First "flying machines"  1903  Introduction of television  1925  Personal computer  1975  Mobile phone  1985  The Internet  1990 ...

Top 10 GSM Phones that "Really" Matter by Saquib Hussain
... The tri-band phone has 80MB internal memory with memory card support of 4GB, and standard office application as well as support for download and installation of tens of thousands of Symbian applications, MP3/video player, FM Radio, Email, Opera 8 browser, handwriting recognition and 3G UMTS support. The P990 is posh but not overpriced. This phone is made for industry leading professionals who need every tool and best communication capability regardless of the price tag.